TN SB1045 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes municipal electrics and electrical cooperatives to provide telecommunication service, including broadband service either on its own or by joint venture or other business relationship with one or more third parties and in geographical areas that are inside and outside the electric plant's service area. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, authorizes municipal electrics and electrical cooperatives to provide telecommunication service, including broadband service either on its own or by joint venture or other business relationship with one or more third parties and in geographical areas that are inside and outside the electric plant's service area. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1410 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-06 - Failed in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee