TN SB1045 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from 10 days to 14 days the minimum number of days advance notice that the state board of equalization must provide an assessor before convening a hearing concerning the assessor's performance of his or her duties. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, changes from 10 days to 14 days the minimum number of days advance notice that the state board of equalization must provide an assessor before convening a hearing concerning the assessor's performance of his or her duties. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1115 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-25 - Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 1/1/2016
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1045&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1045.pdf |