TN SB1045 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 236
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 236
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits election commission members and administrators of elections from hiring relatives for certain election-related positions. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As enacted, prohibits election commission members and administrators of elections from hiring relatives for certain election-related positions. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Yager (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Yager (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Yager (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Yager (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Pub. Ch. 236 | |
2011-05-25 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2011-05-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-11 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-10 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-09 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 4 | |
2011-05-09 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0065) | |
2011-05-09 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-05-04 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-05-02 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-05-02 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-02 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0345) | |
2011-05-02 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0344) | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/2/2011 | |
2011-04-25 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-04-25 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/25/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-22 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1701 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 236