TN SB1041 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, when neither the seller nor purchaser of a firearm is a licensed gun dealer, that the transaction be completed through a licensed gun dealer, and that the dealer perform the same criminal history record check required for purchases from licensed gun dealers. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1161 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee