TN SB1040 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Historic Rehabilitation Investment Incentive Act." - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Historic Rehabilitation Investment Incentive Act." - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Reginald Tate [D] | Sen. Steven Dickerson [R] |
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Lee Harris [D] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Commerce & Labor Comm. 3/21/17 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1061 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee