TN SB1039 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits charter school use of LEA vacant land on same basis that LEA underutilized and vacant properties, other than vacant land, can currently be used; permits property obtained by local governments at tax sales to be conveyed to a charter school for use for its school purposes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, permits charter school use of LEA vacant land on same basis that LEA underutilized and vacant properties, other than vacant land, can currently be used; permits property obtained by local governments at tax sales to be conveyed to a charter school for use for its school purposes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0454 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-21 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1039&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1039.pdf |