TN SB1032 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, reduces the population threshold, from 925 to 700, to make a municipality eligible to hold a referendum on the sale of alcoholic beverages. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcohol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 426 | |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1514 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 05/12/2021