TN SB1032 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the licensure requirement for adult day care providers to include those who provide service to five or more, instead of 10 or more, adult recipients. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 12; Title 49; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, expands the licensure requirement for adult day care providers to include those who provide service to five or more, instead of 10 or more, adult recipients. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 12; Title 49; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Pub. Ch. 276 | |
2017-05-11 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2017-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0214) |
2017-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0261) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Refer to Senate Calendar Committee, pursuant to Rule 31 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0593 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 276