TN SB1022 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies "premises" for purposes of the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption in regard to establishments licensed for such sales in Clarksville within or adjacent to a certain specified area in downtown near the riverwalk; authorizes Clarksville to, by ordinance, reduce or prescribe the hours and days upon which alcoholic beverages, beer, and wine may be consumed in the specified area, within the limits of general law. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 187 | |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1085 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021