TN SB1021 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates the Class A misdemeanor of knowingly giving, selling, lending, delivering, or otherwise transferring a firearm to a person when the transferor knows or reasonably should know that the person receiving the firearm is prohibited from purchasing or possessing a firearm under state or federal law. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-14 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14SenateFailed in Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2023
2023-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023
2023-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2023
2023-03-07SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023
2023-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1439 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback