TN SB1018 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, defines "prior convictions" for multiple offenders as convictions within the past 10 years; defines "prior convictions" for persistent offenders as convictions within the past 15 years. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to sentencing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021
2021-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-04-12SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Judiciary Comm. 4/13/21
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1565 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback