TN SB1013 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Reset on cal. for First Calendar of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Debt Resolution Services Act." - Amends TCA Title 47.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Debt Resolution Services Act." - Amends TCA Title 47.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseReset on cal. for First Calendar of 2020
2019-04-30HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/19
2019-04-29HousePlaced on next avail. cal.
2019-04-17HouseHeld on desk.
2019-04-11HouseReset on cal. for 4/17/2019
2019-04-11HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0102)
2019-04-11HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-25HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-21SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-03-21SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0120)
2019-03-21SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0132)
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-18SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
2019-03-12SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1182 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-11 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback