TN SB1011 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class A misdemeanor offense of illegal transfer of a firearm to a prohibited possessor; prohibits the intentional transfer to a person who is known or should be known to be prohibited from purchasing or possessing a firearm. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, creates the Class A misdemeanor offense of illegal transfer of a firearm to a prohibited possessor; prohibits the intentional transfer to a person who is known or should be known to be prohibited from purchasing or possessing a firearm. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1428 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.