TN SB1008 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires an application for employment with this state or a political subdivision of this state to only require the submission of the applicant's name, address, and pertinent qualifications for the position. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8 and Title 50, relative to government employment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1590 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback