TN SB1008 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits constables who have law enforcement powers to carry firearms at all times and in all places in Tennessee that other law enforcement officers are permitted to carry firearms; requires the constable to receive, at a minimum, 40 hours initial training, within one year of election, and eight hours annual in-service training in firearms qualification administered by a certified law enforcement firearms instructor. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 10 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, permits constables who have law enforcement powers to carry firearms at all times and in all places in Tennessee that other law enforcement officers are permitted to carry firearms; requires the constable to receive, at a minimum, 40 hours initial training, within one year of election, and eight hours annual in-service training in firearms qualification administered by a certified law enforcement firearms instructor. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 10 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 746 | |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2016 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to last calendar |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1094 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 746