TN SB1008 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, defines adequate public notice throughout the code as including, but not limited to, publication of the public meeting or deadline in a newspaper of general circulation, posting notice on an Internet web site or in local newspapers, and posting notice in the building where the meeting or deadline will occur. - Amends TCA Section 1-3-105.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, defines adequate public notice throughout the code as including, but not limited to, publication of the public meeting or deadline in a newspaper of general circulation, posting notice on an Internet web site or in local newspapers, and posting notice in the building where the meeting or deadline will occur. - Amends TCA Section 1-3-105.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-26SenateAssigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
2013-02-06SenateP2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2013-02-04SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-31SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0444 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-05 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback