TN SB1008 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises various provisions governing the Tennessee consolidated retirement system; requires that counsel for treasury department serve as attorney for the chair of TCRS and treasury with regard to deferred or tax-sheltered compensation plans. - Amends TCA Section 8-24-104(c); Title 8, Chapter 25, Part 1; Section 8-25-111; Title 8, Chapter 25, Part 3; Title 8, Chapter 34, Part 2; Section 8-34-203; Section 8-34-302(a)(6); Section 8-34-319; Section 8-34-321; Title 8, Chapter 35, Part 2; Section 8-35-201(d); Section 8-35-218(a); Section 8-36-208(b) and Section 8-36-212.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises various provisions governing the Tennessee consolidated retirement system; requires that counsel for treasury department serve as attorney for the chair of TCRS and treasury with regard to deferred or tax-sheltered compensation plans. - Amends TCA Section 8-24-104(c); Title 8, Chapter 25, Part 1; Section 8-25-111; Title 8, Chapter 25, Part 3; Title 8, Chapter 34, Part 2; Section 8-34-203; Section 8-34-302(a)(6); Section 8-34-319; Section 8-34-321; Title 8, Chapter 35, Part 2; Section 8-35-201(d); Section 8-35-218(a); Section 8-36-208(b) and Section 8-36-212.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-10 Pub. Ch. 140
2011-05-10 Effective date(s) 05/02/11
2011-05-02 Signed by Governor.
2011-04-20 Transmitted to Gov. for action.
2011-04-20 Signed by H. Speaker
2011-04-19 Signed by S. Speaker
2011-04-19 Enrolled and ready for signatures
2011-04-18 Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0
2011-04-18 Subst. for comp. HB.
2011-04-14 Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2011-04-11 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2011-04-11 Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0
2011-04-07 Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/11/2011
2011-04-05 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2011-03-30 Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/5/2011
2011-03-29 Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/5/2011
2011-03-23 Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/29/2011
2011-02-23 P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2011-02-17 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-16 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0707 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 140

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback