TN SB1008 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends department of veterans' affairs, June 30, 2010. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends department of veterans' affairs, June 30, 2010. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-18 Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
2009-03-12 Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 03/18/2009
2009-02-18 P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
2009-02-12 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-11 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1003 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback