TN SB1004 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates sports facilities at private universities as sports authority facilities for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 57-4-102, relative to sports authority facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 55 N: 30 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2021 | |
2021-05-05 | Pub. Ch. 267 | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 55, Nays 30, PNV 7 |
2021-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 4 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1082 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 267