TN SB0999 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the reinstatement of professional and occupational licenses under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 32; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the reinstatement of professional and occupational licenses under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 32; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee / no second |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1218 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-26 - Failed for lack of second in: Business Subcommittee