TN SB0998 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides for the registration of eligible voters upon the submission by the department to the appropriate county election commission of an eligible voter's application for a driver license or photo identification card; establishes methods by which a person may decline to be registered to vote in such a manner. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, provides for the registration of eligible voters upon the submission by the department to the appropriate county election commission of an eligible voter's application for a driver license or photo identification card; establishes methods by which a person may decline to be registered to vote in such a manner. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1210 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-27 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee