TN SB0997 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the date by which the Tennessee education lottery corporation is required to annually submit its proposed operating budget to the department of finance and administration from September 1 to the first business day of September. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 51 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 51 and Title 49, relative to the education lottery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1060 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee