TN SB0996 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state emergency communications board to promulgate rules to establish uniform standards for 911 emergency communications districts that include uniform dispatching requirements and standards and that require emergency communications districts to be staffed by employees or contract workers of the districts; exempts certain urban counties from the requirement. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 86.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7 and Title 86, relative to emergency communications districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0872 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee