TN SB0986 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 05/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 05/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases maximum per diem allowable for commissioners of utility district board in Morgan and Roane Counties, from $300 to $500 per board meeting. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 82, Part 3 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 82, Part 3 and Title 66, relative to utility districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Effective date(s) 05/05/2023 | |
2023-05-17 | Pub. Ch. 345 | |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-04-13 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/10/2023 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0280 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 345