TN SB0985 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, adds to sentencing considerations available community-based alternatives to confinement and the benefits that imposing such alternatives may provide to the community should be considered when the offense is nonviolent and the defendant is the primary caregiver of a dependent child. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, adds to sentencing considerations available community-based alternatives to confinement and the benefits that imposing such alternatives may provide to the community should be considered when the offense is nonviolent and the defendant is the primary caregiver of a dependent child. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 41.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Pub. Ch. 309
2019-05-13 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-05-08SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-30SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-29HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-29HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-22HousePassed H., Ayes 91, Nays 5, PNV 0
2019-04-22HousePassed H., Ayes 91, Nays 5, PNV 0
2019-04-22HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0352)
2019-04-22HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-22HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-18SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-18SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 4
2019-04-18SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0273)
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-09SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 0
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1449 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 309

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback