TN SB0985 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 325
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 325
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Sudden Cardiac Arrest Prevention Act." - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Sudden Cardiac Arrest Prevention Act." - Amends TCA Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Sen. Reginald Tate [D] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 325 | |
2015-05-06 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2016 | |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2015-04-13 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0184) |
2015-04-13 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0183) |
2015-04-13 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0206) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0205) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0032 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 325