TN SB0985 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases franchise and excise tax credit for financial institutions donating to the Tennessee rural development opportunity fund from 10 percent of contribution to 12 percent of contribution. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases franchise and excise tax credit for financial institutions donating to the Tennessee rural development opportunity fund from 10 percent of contribution to 12 percent of contribution. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-29 Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
2011-03-08 Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm.
2011-02-23 P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
2011-02-17 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-16 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1431 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-30 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback