TN SB0985 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, revises regulation of billing for cytopathology services to refer instead to "anatomic pathology services." - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, revises regulation of billing for cytopathology services to refer instead to "anatomic pathology services." - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-07 Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm.
2009-04-15 Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 4/29/2009
2009-04-09 Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 04/15/2009
2009-02-18 P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm.
2009-02-12 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-11 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1746 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-11 - Assigned to s/c Professional Occupations of HHR

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback