TN SB0982 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires any program that is a community-based alternative to incarceration to offer to all eligible persons participating in their program information on restoration of voting rights. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2, Part 1; Title 40, Chapter 29 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 2, Part 1; Title 40, Chapter 29 and Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to restoration of rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-10SenateWithdrawn.
2024-01-10SenateRecalled from Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-03-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023
2023-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023
2023-03-21SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023
2023-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0113 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback