TN SB0982 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires law enforcement agencies, victim-witness coordinators, district attorneys general, and other state employees who frequently encounter victims of crime to distribute information, whenever appropriate, on the statewide automated victim information and notification system; requires the Tennessee sheriffs' association to provide digital copies of relevant information to each such entity. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 3; Title 38; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, requires law enforcement agencies, victim-witness coordinators, district attorneys general, and other state employees who frequently encounter victims of crime to distribute information, whenever appropriate, on the statewide automated victim information and notification system; requires the Tennessee sheriffs' association to provide digital copies of relevant information to each such entity. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 3; Title 38; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1326 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-25 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0982&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SB0982.pdf |