TN SB0978 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/17/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/17/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the officer of elections at each polling place to post a sign on election day informing voters that it is against the law to vote in a political party's primary without being a bona fide member of or affiliated with that political party, or to declare allegiance to that party without the intent to affiliate with that party. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to polling places.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 55 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 55 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Effective date(s) 05/17/2023 | |
2023-05-24 | Pub. Ch. 473 | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-05-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 55, Nays 27, PNV 1 |
2023-04-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0212) |
2023-04-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-04-19 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 19, Nays 9, PNV 1 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0427) |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0828 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 473