TN SB0977 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends eligibility for receipt of Wilder-Naifeh technical skills grants to students who are attending certain independent postsecondary institutions and who are otherwise eligible for the grants. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, extends eligibility for receipt of Wilder-Naifeh technical skills grants to students who are attending certain independent postsecondary institutions and who are otherwise eligible for the grants. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1199 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee