TN SB0977 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends eligibility for receipt of Wilder-Naifeh technical skills grants to students who are attending certain independent postsecondary institutions and who are otherwise eligible for the grants. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends eligibility for receipt of Wilder-Naifeh technical skills grants to students who are attending certain independent postsecondary institutions and who are otherwise eligible for the grants. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1199 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Def. to Summer Lottery Calendar

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback