TN SB0975 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the military department to issue per diem, not to exceed $20.00, to defray the cost of one meal for members of volunteer honor guards appearing at veterans' funerals, subject to availability of funds. - Amends TCA Title 58.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the military department to issue per diem, not to exceed $20.00, to defray the cost of one meal for members of volunteer honor guards appearing at veterans' funerals, subject to availability of funds. - Amends TCA Title 58.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1466 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback