TN SB0974 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes from the definition of marijuana the requirement that an institution of higher education be certified by the drug enforcement agency to work with low-cannabidiol cannabis oil. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-402 and Chapter 936 of the Public Acts of 2014.
Title
As introduced, removes from the definition of marijuana the requirement that an institution of higher education be certified by the drug enforcement agency to work with low-cannabidiol cannabis oil. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-402 and Chapter 936 of the Public Acts of 2014.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0936 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning