TN SB0971 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, establishes requirements for person or organization that has not been designated by the county election commission to conduct supplemental voter registration drives that attempts to register 100 or more people to vote; revises and adds various provisions governing elections. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, establishes requirements for person or organization that has not been designated by the county election commission to conduct supplemental voter registration drives that attempts to register 100 or more people to vote; revises and adds various provisions governing elections. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 250
2019-04-25SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-24SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/25/2019
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-22SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-18SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-09SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1079 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 250

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0971&ga=111
Texthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SB0971.pdf
Texthttp://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/111/pub/pc0250.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/SA0258.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/SA0259.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/SA0260.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/SA0345.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/SA0346.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/SA0365.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/SA0393.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/SA0394.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/SA0412.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/SB0971.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM1106.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM1160.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM1469.pdf
Roll Callhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0971&ga=111

Bill Comments

feedback