TN SB0961 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the time from 90 to 120 days after the end of the fiscal year in which a nonprofit Books to Birth partner has to annually submit to the governor and the speakers of the senate and the house of representatives a complete and detailed report setting forth its operation and accomplishments. - Amends TCA Title 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends the time from 90 to 120 days after the end of the fiscal year in which a nonprofit Books to Birth partner has to annually submit to the governor and the speakers of the senate and the house of representatives a complete and detailed report setting forth its operation and accomplishments. - Amends TCA Title 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019
2019-04-09SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1139 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-25 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback