TN SB0960 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department of revenue to report, by December 1 of each year, the number of physical fitness facilities from which the amusement tax was collected in the previous calendar year to the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 2 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the department of revenue to report, by December 1 of each year, the number of physical fitness facilities from which the amusement tax was collected in the previous calendar year to the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 2 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 1 PNV 0
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-03-06SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee with recommendation, as amended
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2019
2019-02-26SenateRefer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1138 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback