TN SB0957 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes the requirement that a delinquent or unruly child committed to the custody of the department for an indefinite time remain in custody for no longer than six months in absence of certain circumstances; requires a delinquent or unruly child committed to the custody of the department for an indefinite time to remain in the department's custody until discharge or other placement is warranted by the child's response to evidence-based services and programs or so long as necessary to receive evidence-based treatment or services provided by a qualified provider. - Amends TCA Title 37.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, relative to juveniles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1098 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback