TN SB0956 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the annual deadline for distributing the Annual Report on the Quality of Kerosene and Motor Fuel in Tennessee from September 15 to September 30. - Amends TCA Title 47.
Title
As introduced, changes the annual deadline for distributing the Annual Report on the Quality of Kerosene and Motor Fuel in Tennessee from September 15 to September 30. - Amends TCA Title 47.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0953 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-16 - Taken off notice for cal. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0956&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0956.pdf |