TN SB0953 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends group insurance to state employees who have been employed by the state for at least 60 days instead of 24 months and who will work 640 hours instead of 1,450 hours within a fiscal year whether compensated on hourly, daily, monthly, or piecework basis. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27.
Title
As introduced, extends group insurance to state employees who have been employed by the state for at least 60 days instead of 24 months and who will work 640 hours instead of 1,450 hours within a fiscal year whether compensated on hourly, daily, monthly, or piecework basis. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0886 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0953&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0953.pdf |