TN SB0953 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits entities that audit prescription drug records from denying reimbursement for claims submitted by pharmacies and health care providers based on clerical errors. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 1; Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 31; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, prohibits entities that audit prescription drug records from denying reimbursement for claims submitted by pharmacies and health care providers based on clerical errors. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 1; Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 31; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Recalled from S. C&L Comm. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0953&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0953.pdf |