TN SB0951 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits expenditure of proceeds received by nonprofit organization from sale of specialty license plates to pay attorney's fees, court costs, or other expenses attributable to lawsuit filed against state or local government. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, prohibits expenditure of proceeds received by nonprofit organization from sale of specialty license plates to pay attorney's fees, court costs, or other expenses attributable to lawsuit filed against state or local government. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1037 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee