TN SB0951 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes outdated language from transportation equity trust fund provisions. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 56, Part 2; Title 9, Chapter 4 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, removes outdated language from transportation equity trust fund provisions. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 56, Part 2; Title 9, Chapter 4 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1320 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-19 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0951&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0951.pdf |