TN SB0947 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds a religious exemption from the requirement to register a motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, adds a religious exemption from the requirement to register a motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1486 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback