TN SB0946 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, eliminates the 4 percent state sales tax on food for human consumption; increases the tax on cigarettes from three cents per cigarette to 8.35 cents per cigarette; increases the tax on other tobacco products from 6.6 percent to 17 percent of the wholesale cost price. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, eliminates the 4 percent state sales tax on food for human consumption; increases the tax on cigarettes from three cents per cigarette to 8.35 cents per cigarette; increases the tax on other tobacco products from 6.6 percent to 17 percent of the wholesale cost price. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-02-12SenateRefer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1213 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback