TN SB0945 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of economic and community development to make quarterly reports instead of annual reports regarding TNInvestcos; requires the report to be submitted to all members of the general assembly rather than only the chairs of the finance committees; requires the comptroller of the treasury to develop a numerical grading system for all tax increment financing (TIF) plans; requires the comptroller to evaluate TIF plans based on the benefits the municipality is receiving from the plan and the cost of the active plan to the taxpayers in the jurisdiction. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 28 and Title 9, Chapter 23.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 28 and Title 9, Chapter 23, relative to financing.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1317 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee