TN SB0944 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires secretary of state to conduct a study of each state that has authorized or proposed legislation to authorize sports gaming; requires the secretary to assess the economic impact and regulatory oversight of gaming in each state and report the findings to the governor and each member of the general assembly no later than January 10, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 29; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49 and Title 67, relative to sports gaming.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1556 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback