TN SB0939 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Medical Assistance Savings Act" to require health insurance policies to cover a dependent child until the child reaches 26 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Medical Assistance Savings Act" to require health insurance policies to cover a dependent child until the child reaches 26 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 56.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/16/2019
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1429 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback