TN SB0938 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Private Prison Alignment Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Private Prison Alignment Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1408 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Def. to Summer Study in Corrections Subcommittee